Trustees STOKENHAM VILLAGE GREEN ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1090879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David George Lyall | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michele Jayne Hull | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN GEORGE NUTTALL-SMITH | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
winston chubb | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
mark ford | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
sue ford | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John o'connell | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HAYES | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Hayes | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PAMELA NUTTALL-SMITH | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.