Trustees YARM SCHOOL
Charity number: 1093434
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK THOMPSON BA ACMA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Irvine Ferguson | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Isabelle Mitchell | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Brown | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shazia Naz Akowuah | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David de Jong | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph Barron | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frances Lovat | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Michael Chapman | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Martin Turner | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.