Trustees Beaminster Preschool Limited
Charity number: 1102042
Charity reporting is up to date (162 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Keith Marklew | Chair | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Marsh | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Roland Tanner | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Barry Hughes | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Battrick | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Biggs | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Dawkins | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Green | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Jayne Whitlock | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.