Governing document PREVENT BREAST CANCER LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 MAY 2005 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 MAY 2016 as amended on 26 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES, PARTICULARLY THOSE CONCERNED WITH GENETIC RESEARCH INTO BREAST CANCER, WHOSOEVER SITUATE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM ( PROVIDED THAT ALL SUCH RECIPIENTS BEING IN EACH AND EVERY CASE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS THAT WILL DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH THEREOF) AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR LIKE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.