Trustees THE PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF WOLFSON COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1138143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF JANE CLARKE | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex James Trinidad | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Melody Susan Clark | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Gulab Ramchandani | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ana Luisa Toribio | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Paul Vinnell | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Lionel Norman Wood | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Philip Crookall | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Mark Greenbank | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Brian Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNETTE MARIE ALCANTARA | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Virginia Felicity Jane Newcombe | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen Evans | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hilary Cheffins | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN LARSEN | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.