Trustees HMM ARTS LTD
Charity number: 1108488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Ball | Chair | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Louise Worrow | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jones | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olha Voropai | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gloria June Partridge | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen O'Connor | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Slawson | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Jacob Green | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN WILSON GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.