Governing document CYNGOR AR BOPETH SIR DDINBYCH CITIZENS ADVICE DENBIGHSHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2005. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2022 as amended on 01 May 2024
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in the whole of England and Wales, principally Denbighshire and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
DENBIGHSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.