Trustees WELLINGTON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1111155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valsa De Winter | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Fullagar | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Simmonds | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Westcott | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Hill | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sparkes | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Saunders | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Darts | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.