Trustees THE BELTEX SHEEP SOCIETY
Charity number: 1118873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dafydd Emyrs Owen | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant McKenzie Ireland | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Grant Findlay | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Howieson | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Charlotte Bradley Shuttleworth | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morton | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Rhys Evans | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward O'Neill | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Colin Little | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Preston | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew McGarva | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henry Clifford Jewitt | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.