Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE HAMPSHIRE
Charity number: 1122695
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Moxon | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Diane Brooks | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann McNeice | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Margaret Winstanley | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Prof Thomas Antony Downes | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Felicity Gooding | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Martin Ellis Stern | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen Roy Bowden | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR RICHARD MACKAY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.