Trustees DOLEN FFERMIO (FARMING LINK)
Charity number: 1124195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORNA ANNE BROWN | Chair | 06 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Gunnell | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rona Dorothy Gunnell | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lena Maren Fritsch | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kadun Lorcan Midwinter Rees | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin William Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
CORDELIA WEEDON | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY SMITH | Trustee | 09 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
EMYR OWEN | Trustee | 06 November 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.