Trustees JESUS COLLEGE WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY AND CITY OF OXFORD OF QUEEN ELIZABETH'S FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1137435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
55 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF SIR NIGEL SHADBOLT FRS FREng | Chair | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||||||
David Mason | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor James Naismith | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ivona Hideg | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Matthew Kerry | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Ricardo Rocha | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Frances Williams | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Ben Michael Goldacre | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Geraldine Wright | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jean Baccelli | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Seth Flaxman | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Fabian Grabenhorst | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Milo Phillips-Brown | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Daniel Altshuler | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor David Willis | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Berta Verd | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Dirk Van Hulle | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr STEPHEN CONWAY | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr BRITTANY WELLNER JAMES | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Dr MILES JACKSON | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr STANISLAS ZIVNY | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF JUDITH ROUSSEAU | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr BENJAMIN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF Stefan Dercon | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF Raymond Pierrehumbert | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF TIM COULSON | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF Luca Enriques | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Goffin | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF Georg Hollander | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Malcolm John | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF Kylie Vincent | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruedi Baumann | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr STEPHEN MORRIS | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ROBIN EVANS | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
DR RICHARD GREYNER | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ALEXANDRA GAJDA | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF YULIN CHEN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr SIMON DOUGLAS | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF PAUL RILEY | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF EDWARD ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr ARMAND D'ANGOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DR PETER ESO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr SUZANNE ASPDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF PAULINA KEWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr STEPHEN JOHN MAGORRIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF PATRICIA ORCHID DALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr STUART GORDON WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF SHANKAR SRINIVAS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Professor CAROLINE WARMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PROF KATRIN KOHL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF MARK BROUARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr ALEXANDRA LUMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF ANDREW DANCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr JAMES OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF JAMES TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.