Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Charity number: 1132208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
297 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicola Briggs | Chair | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Bekkie Wright | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Kathryn Ritson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rachel Leather | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Pippa Lupton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Frank Watson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rachel Parkinson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Wilde | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Lydia Harrison | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Henry Chung | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jennifer Bywaters | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Iraj Irfan | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Gillian Wormersley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Brazier | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Kimberley Shorley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
James Carver | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Brown | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Angela Allport | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Angleena Keizer | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Charlotte Hambly | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Iris Bray | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Mark Tizzard | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Janet Bryer | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Samantha Parfitt | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Sara Cliff | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Germany | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Emily Barry | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Howard Stringer | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Elizabeth Ward | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Daud Irfan | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Helen Sweeny | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Pickles | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Cameron Hume | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jennifer Porter-Pryde | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Nicholas Lakin | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Tracey Darling | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev John Yarrien | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Helen Webster Deacon | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Mirium Moul | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Miller | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Charity Madenyika | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Lorraine Davis | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev David Lees | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Angela Long | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Theresa Simons-Sam | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Richard Walsh | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dennis Beaumont | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jacqui Watson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jean Treleven | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jill Orrell | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Briggs | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Al Henry | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Denise Williamson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Becki Stennett | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Pauline Jackson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Nancy Acquaah | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ROBERT ALDERMAN | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Susan Brumpton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Judith Cole | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Jane Goodfellow | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Grocott | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Audrey Ilderton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Heather Turner | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Keith Walton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev JULIE IRENE COATES | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Jane Ratcliffe | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Suzie Viana Deacon | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
DENIS BEAUMONT | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev RACHEL BENDING | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Cleopas Sibanda | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev GRAHAM EDWARDS | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Isabel Brislen | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Moses Tandayi | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Judith Stoddart | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Jill Henderson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ELIZABETH TALBOT | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Debbie Marsh | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rachel Borgars | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rosamund Hollingsworth | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rebecca Ainsworth | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Julia Skitt | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Tanya Cook | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Karen James | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Latika Singh | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Gillian de Bourcier | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
David Pendle | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Julia Reid | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Sarah Parkin | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Stephanie Njeru | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Matthew Forsyth | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
PAUL SPRAY | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jacqueline Goddard | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev stuart WILD | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Leigh Maydew | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Ann Fox | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Paul Critchley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev David Goodall | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Philip Gough | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Tat Cheong Luk | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Langley Mackrell-Hey | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev ELIZABETH SINGLETON | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Judith Simms | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev DAVID WILLIS | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Linda Brown | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Mmasape Zihle | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Helen Lunn | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Linda Jane Catlow | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Julie Morton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Samantha Hagerman | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Daniel Haylett | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Thomas Reed | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Sarah Reed | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Jeanette Saxby | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Sterling | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Gillion | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Olive Ruzvidzo | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Luke Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dallion Roye | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jane Carter | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jane Peers | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Bill Topping | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Janet Park | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Grace Pratt Morris Chapman | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Victoria Davidson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Judith Kirk | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Peter Taylor | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dawn Nadim | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Hemingway | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Fyall | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jean Hawxhurst | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Vincent Jambawo | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Janet Corlett | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Marian Izzard | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
John Bassall | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Omobolaji Nzekwe | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Paul Carver | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Helen Norton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Stephen Watson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Gillian Gilmore | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Chloe Twist | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Owen Wilkins | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Lesley Cook | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Valerie Reid | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Mark Williamson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Alan Petron-Bell | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Lee O'Neill | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Mark Hammond | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
John Tranter | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Ramona Dinard | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
John Logan | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev David Turtle | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Maggie Woods | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Martin Beukes | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Linda Kinchennton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Sean Turner | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Carolyn Godfrey | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jon Purcell | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Graham Pegg | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Eduardo Almeida | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Patricia Oakley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rebecca Belshaw | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Stephen Peck | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jacqueline Evans | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Kerry Scarlett | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Tino Makonise | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Julie Swann | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Michael May | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Quophie Anochie Ababio | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Anna Herriman | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Sandra Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Melvin Kelly | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Christine Hordley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Sandra Orborski | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Hope Wild | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Helen Croft | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
James Garnett | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
STEPHEN HOWARD COOPER | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Benjamin Scrivens | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Margaret Bowerman | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rory Dalgliesh | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Barbara Easton | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Zena Smith | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Ruth Dawson | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Niall Michael Briggs | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Dr Heather Morris | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Paul Smith | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dr David Field | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
John Spencer | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Kerry Tankard | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Michael Pryke | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Richard Sheard | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Trish Earlam | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
ALISTER MCCLURE | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Karen Beecham | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Beti Holmes | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Naomi Prince | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Margaret Greer | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Ermine Mitchell | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
David Watson | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Robert Roberts | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Catherine Bird | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Karen Attaway | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Revd John Ritson | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Joanna Rand | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Janice Rusling | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd P J Jackson | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Emma Crippen | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Novette Headley | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dudley Coates | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Maggie Finbow | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Naomi Kaiga | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Laura Tunnacliffe | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Ruth Yorke | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd George Mawire | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Jackie Whitehouse | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Joanne Mary Anderton BA Hons | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Etleva Walker | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dawn Julia Saunders | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Barbara Joan Harrison | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Steven William Thomas Rogers | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Ormrod | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Dr Karl Aidan Rutlidge | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Deacon Tracey Jane Hume | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Katharine Elizabeth Crew | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
JANET ARTHUR | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Andrew Lowe | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Daniel Mark Keen | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr James Neal Tebbutt | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Paul Anthony Yarrien | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Steven Robert McKay Cooper | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Emma Caroline Holroyd | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Sonia Marcia Hicks | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Alan James Window | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Kerry Wayne Tankard | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Sandra Haywood | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jacqueline Bellfield | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Helen D Cameron | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Patrick Kofi Amissah | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
James Tristan Carver | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Eleanor Jane Allin | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rachel Ann Bending | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
James David Blackhall | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Hannah Eve Bevan | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Steven Mark Slaney | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Helen Elizabeth Woodall | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Charity Nzegwu | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Canon Julian Mark Pursehouse | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Helen Ruth Kirk | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev HELEN RUTH HOLLANDS | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Simon Christopher Edwards | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Dr Richard Vautrey | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Dr Daleep Mukarji | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Peter de Ville | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev DELYTH ANGHARAD LIDDELL | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Mark Rowland | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Richard Mark Andrew | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
CAROLYN HOTHERSALL | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Ian Stuart Rutherford | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Susan Jane Eldridge | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Ruby Beech | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Pamela Joy Lavender | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Dr Jonathan Richard Hustler | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
DEACON KAREN MCBRIDE | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev R Margaret K Mwailu | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jongikaya Zihle | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
DEACON JONATHAN MILLER | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev David Michael Chapman | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
SUSAN SMITH | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev LESLIE MICHAEL NEWTON | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Balachandren Muthuvaloe Gnanapragasam | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
David Henry James | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev NIGEL Timothy COWGILL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev DARREN GARFIELD | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Ian Christopher White | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev PHILIP JAMES JACKSON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev CATHERINE EMMA DIXON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Matthew Charles Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev STEPHEN JOHN LINDRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
ANNA MARGARET MALNUTT | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Sheryl Milanda Anderson PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Revd Dr Andrew John Lunn | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Jonathan Howard Pye | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
REV GILL NEWTON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
CHRISTINE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Katrin Anne Hackett | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Jennifer Anne Hurd | Trustee | 06 July 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
MR DOUG SWANNEY | Trustee | 06 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
REV JENNY DYER | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev ROSEMARIE ELAINE GAYE CLARKE | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev LORAINE NANCY MELLOR | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev BRUCE DAVID THOMPSON | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Michaela Anne Youngson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
MARTIN JOHN HARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ELIZABETH HELEN OVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
CAROLINE MARY STEAD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Stephen David Wigley | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.