Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN AND ST LUKE, BILTON, HARROGATE
Charity number: 1132843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON PAUL DOWSON | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
EMMA JAMES | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JOHN ASHURST | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA SUSAN BLYDE | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY JANET HILDRED | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
ALETHEA FRY | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Golightly | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Mary Martin MSc, DipHE | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Louise Iles BSc Hons | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jan Lizbeth Johnson BSc, PhD | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
NOEL JAMES DUKE | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NETHERWOOD BROWN MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH REICHERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL THOMPSON BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE WISE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.