Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH, PECKHAM
Charity number: 1131457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Cecil-Haffner | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Cynthia Enofu Ohwariovbe | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Regaugetswe Osei-Bonsu | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Melanie Omolaso | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Flora Jeanetta Bowen | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jacob Omolaso | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Musinguzi | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Kagoro | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
EMEKA KINGSLEY ANUDU | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KEHINDE OYEBANJO ACCA | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL ROBERT HARTLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
Rosemund Adikiyeofori Pretoru | Trustee | 25 April 2010 |
|
|
||||||
DENNIS AKPOMUDIARE OHWARIOVBE | Trustee | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
||||||
Sonia Clare Phippard | Trustee | 21 April 2002 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.