Governing document Kings Cliffe Community Hive
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 FEB 2022 as amended on 02 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANYONE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS OLD THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.