Accounts and annual returns GRAVESHAM MUSLIMS CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Charity number: 1136194
Charity reporting is up to date (197 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 February 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 February 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 February 2024 | 562 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 February 2024 | 562 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 November 2021 | 488 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 November 2021 | 488 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 30 November 2021 | 854 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 30 November 2021 | 854 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window