Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS EALING
Charity number: 1134041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JUSTIN DAVID DODD | Chair | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Shine Raj | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Gray | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hawkes | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Margaret Hamerton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Azmaer Samuel | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Coleman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jamil | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jack McConnel | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Douglas Robinson | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Gaynor Alison Breen | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Jack | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN ELIZABETH NORMAN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE EILEEN KIRKLEY | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY MATHER | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAISMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.