Trustees ACTION 21 (2010)
Charity number: 1136450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL HARRIS | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rameshchandra Patel | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John O Maoileoin | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMMA KNIGHTS | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Cockcroft | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Raducan | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Margaret Pyke | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID POLLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET BEGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.