Accounts and annual returns ACTIVATED CITIZENS
Charity number: 1145568
Charity reporting is overdue by 1809 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 348 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 348 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 713 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 713 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1078 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1078 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1443 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1443 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1809 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1809 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window