Trustees HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY
Charity number: 1147717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Nixon | Chair | 28 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Tamanna Jitesh | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Mace | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Thomas Klages | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Barbara Ama Ansah Panfu Bray | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Clive Beer | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Ken Sloan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ken Greetham | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Ben Shipston | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Liz Salter | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Uloma Uhunmwangho | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr John Reade | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Talib Sheikh | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foster Griffiths | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Hawkins | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Tim Watson | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Deborah Jane Hewett | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
REBECCA PAYNE | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA FOLKES | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Dominic Wong | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.