Accounts and annual returns AL-MADINA INTERNATIONAL ISLAMIC INSTITUTION SYLHET
Charity number: 1149207
Charity reporting is up to date (282 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 19 December 2019 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | 19 December 2019 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window