Trustees BRITISH SARCOMA GROUP
Charity number: 1154928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Elizabeth Alsousou | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Vass | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Thomas John Lee | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Benson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Louise Artis | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Millman | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sherron Furtado | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anant Desai | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Ioanna Fragkandrea-Nixon | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owen Tilsley | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Dangoor | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG HAMILTON GERRAND | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN HAYES | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.