Trustees MILTON KEYNES AND BROUGHTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1159174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID WILLIAM MONK DSC BSC | Chair | 05 April 2001 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Conner | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare May Rishi | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Brighton | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerard William Powis | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA BUTLER | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kay Munro | Trustee | 06 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CORLETT | Trustee | 05 April 1998 |
|
|||||
PETE MATHISON | Trustee | 06 April 1983 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA EASTAFF | Trustee | 06 April 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.