Trustees THE COMMUNITY STOREHOUSE
Charity number: 1162887
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Walter | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Michael Meakins | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Seymour Cable | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Manchester | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Beth Wright | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Adelaide Lloyd | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN CLEMENTS | Trustee | 07 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.