Trustees AIREBOROUGH VOLUNTARY SERVICES TO THE ELDERLY (AVSED)
Charity number: 1165792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN ELLIOTT | Chair | 11 October 2004 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gray | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Doubtfire | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Naylor Latty | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine O'Brien | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Pearce | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Bower | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Blanshard | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hanson | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.