Trustees ARCHIVES WEST MIDLANDS
Charity number: 1168386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Louise Sampson | Chair | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Cook | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justine Samantha Pick | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carys Ellen Fyson | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pedro Miguel Cravinho Lopes | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Dakin | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Oxborrow-Cowan | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Dungey | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lewis | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Clare Watson | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Fox McKenzie | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|||||
JANENE COX | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.