Trustees East Cheshire Eye Society
Charity number: 1174656
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA DILKES | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY EDWARD WEYMAN | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH COSTIGAN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
elizabeth may durham | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
pamela hodgkiss | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN HUGH FREDERICK TURNER | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|||||
martin welch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIDGET SELF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.