Accounts and annual returns OASIS ACADEMY SHIRLEY PARK PRIMARY PTA
Charity number: 1177299
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 305 days | |
Annual return | 18 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 670 days | |
Annual return | 18 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 1035 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 1035 days | |
Annual return | 18 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1400 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1400 days | |
Annual return | 18 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1766 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1766 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window