Governing document AGE CONCERN CENTRAL LANCASHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED 1 JULY 1986, 25 FEBRUARY 1987, 26 JUNE 1992, 24 MARCH 1994, 27 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 24 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE AGED PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE CITY BOUNDARIES OF PRESTON AND THE DISTRICTS OF SOUTH RIBBLE, CHORLEY AND WEST LANCASHIRE
Area of benefit
THE CITY BOUNDARIES OF PRESTON AND THE DISTRICTS OF SOUTH RIBBLE, CHORLEY AND WEST LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.