Trustees THE WARWICKSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Charity number: 1185351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Struthers | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Claire Whitehead-Wall | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mary Bloxham | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Gill | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Dudley | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Forknell | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth McCartney | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Postlehwaite | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Baker | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Chapman | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE DYER | Trustee | 19 March 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.