Governing document WALSALL BREAST CANCER SELF-HELP GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1984, 26 MARCH 1986, 28 AUGUST 1991 AND 30 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(1)RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER.(2)TO ENGAGE IN ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY LESSEN THE SUFFERING OF SUCH WOMEN AND ANCILLARY THERETO, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF FAMILIES AND CARERS OF THOSE WOMEN, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG SUCH FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.