Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BENTLEY
Charity number: 1191023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Berry | Chair | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Farmer | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachael-Leigh Clowes | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Katharine Price | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Clarke | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Walker | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Davies | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dave Walker | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Paine | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Siddle | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.