Trustees AVONWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1192225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Olivia Tiller | Chair | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Louise Wilson-Roberts | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Andrews | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Davina Louise Pritchard | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Louise Saunders | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Charlotte Brelsford | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikolett Csudai | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Holmes | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Marie Cornish | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Short | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Marie James | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Beatrice Bates | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Elizabeth Goodyear | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.