Trustees ALT VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 519835
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALMA MARGARET MASON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Hooton | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Thornley | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Meredith | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Rimmer | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Sweeney | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY BAUGH | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN MCDONOUGH | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERRY BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.