Trustees FONTMELL MAGNA VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1204403
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosie-Anne Yates | Chair | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Andrew John Herbert Davis | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Natasha Anne Harris | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Murchie | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL FRANCIS HOBBS | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Roger Franklin Hillman | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Peter John Mole | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Derek John Bone | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Lloyd Rucker | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD STAINER | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Heledd Sian Highnam | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Le Druillenec | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.