Governing document FOREST YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF EAST LONDON
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 2ND FEBRUARY 1994, 3RD FEBRUARY 1999, 5TH JULY 2000 AND 27 JULY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(I) TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM. (II) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM. (III) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (IV) TO PROVIDE, IMPROVE AND MANAGE HOUSES AND HOSTELS PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN OF ALL AGES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. (V) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RELIEF FROM POVERTY (VI) TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN CHRISTIANITY AND OTHER FAITHS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.