Dogfen lywodraethu SOUTHPORT FLOWER SHOW
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25/02/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS: 22/08/1990, 09/12/1992, 18/10/1996, 13/12/1996; CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME 21/01/1997 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12/07/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2019 as amended on 17 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF HORTICULTURE INCLUDING LIFESTYLE AND ENVIRONMENTAL ACTIVITIES. THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORTICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.