Governing document UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - YORK
Charity number: 1007843

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1990 AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 1992 AND 26 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 19 Mar 2022 as amended on 13 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
YORK AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.