Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - YORK
Charity Number: 1007843

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Sawyer | Chair | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SLEE | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Jeffrey Stuart Todd | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mary Teresa Morwood-Leyland | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beryl Aranka Oppenheim | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Charles Walters | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pilot | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Triggs | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Quinton Charles Smith | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.