Accounts and annual returns ROMSEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORSE SHOW SOCIETY

Charity number: 1007948
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 November 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 18 November 2024 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 26 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 26 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 September 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 04 September 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window