Trustees ROMSEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORSE SHOW SOCIETY
Charity number: 1007948

Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORTON Vincent WELCH | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Riley | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dan Hallett | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Denise Brooks | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Harper-Adams | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Patricia Holmes | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter John McVean | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN FOORD | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATRICIA CORBIN | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE ANN KELL | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MICHAEL CORBIN | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEAN ROWLANDSON | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HARTAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MONK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY JANE RAWSON-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.