Financial history ROMSEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORSE SHOW SOCIETY

Charity number: 1007948
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £404.19k £48.93k £30.33k £364.72k £279.13k
Total expenditure £348.40k £96.66k £72.31k £299.67k £296.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.50k £16.00k £14.50k £6.00k £8.00k