Financial history DOWNHAM MARKET WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.71k £455 £2.75k £1.99k £5.16k
Total expenditure £2.40k £327 £3.24k £2.65k £5.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A