Financial history CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1046526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.05k £57.05k £76.64k £65.27k £69.01k
Total expenditure £88.38k £53.25k £96.63k £71.08k £75.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A