Trustees CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1046526

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Anne Hodgkinson | Chair | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Rosemary Allan | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Deeks | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ma Vita Perpetual Enriquez | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Bailey | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Cowan | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE WALKER | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE SUSAN BROWN | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNIFER WHOLLEY | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MEG MARGARET ELIZABETH CHAPMAN | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Alldred | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.