Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF JAMES MEW FOR POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN AND WOMEN
Charity number: 234600
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 04 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 14 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 29 August 2008 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 31 July 2007 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 31 July 2007 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 07 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 07 July 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window