Governing document CHARITY OF JAMES MEW FOR POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN AND WOMEN
Charity number: 234600
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 30TH MAY 1913 AND SCHEMES OF THE 3RD JULY 1961 AND 5TH SEPTEMBER 1969, 4TH OCTOBER 1977, 31ST DECEMBER 1980 AND 3RD AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
A PENSION OF NOT MORE THAN ú52 A YEAR TO POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 65 YEARS OF AGE AND POOR AND AFFLICTED WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. (FOR CONDITIONS SEE SCHEME OF THE 5TH SEPTEMBER 1969)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNRESTRICTED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.