Financial history CHARITY OF JAMES MEW FOR POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN AND WOMEN

Charity number: 234600
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £7.76k £8.63k £8.08k £7.86k £7.35k
Total expenditure £15.67k £11.01k £8.81k £7.68k £6.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A