Governance LANGLEY PUBLIC INSTITUTE
Charity number: 242372

Charity reporting is up to date (147 days late)
Registration history:
- 19 July 1965: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 January 2010: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 July 2015: Re-registered
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 June 2019: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.